VA HB789 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0547)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0547)
Summary
Campaign finance disclosure; filings by political action committees. Requires any political action committee that files its statement of organization on or after October 1 and before the November election day in any odd-numbered year (i) to file a campaign finance report for the committee's activities during that year with its statement of organization and (ii) to file reports within 24 hours of receiving any contribution of $500 or more during the period between the date of filing its statement of organization and the election day. The bill provides for a civil penalty of $500 for the failure to file any such report and $1,000 for each additional failure.
Title
Campaign finance disclosure; filings by PACs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0547) | |
2008-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 547 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-05 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-05 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB789ER) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-06 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-06 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-06 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-05 | House: Printed as engrossed 087614564-E | |
2008-02-05 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB789E | |
2008-02-05 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-02-05 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-04 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-01 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-15 | House: Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087614564 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB789 |