VA HB786 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0820)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0820)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Guardianship and conservatorship; restoration of capacity or modification or termination of order; informal written communication. Allows a person subject to a guardianship or conservatorship who is not represented by counsel to initiate the process to be restored to capacity or have such guardianship or conservatorship modified or terminated by sending informal written communication to the court, in lieu of the petition requirement specified under current law. Guardianship and conservatorship; restoration of capacity or modification or termination of order; informal written communication. Allows a person subject to a guardianship or conservatorship who is not represented by counsel to initiate the process to be restored to capacity or have such guardianship or conservatorship modified or terminated by sending informal written communication to the court, in lieu of the petition requirement specified under current law.
Title
Guardianship and conservatorship; restoration or modification or termination of order.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0820) | |
2024-04-17 | House | Enacted, Chapter 820 (effective 7/1/24) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB786ER2) |
2024-04-17 | House | Reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-04-17 | House | BLOCK VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-04-17 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-04-08 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB786ER) |
2024-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-08 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB786H1 |
2024-02-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24106747D-H1 |
2024-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106747D-H1 |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-29 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104780D |