VA HB784 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-26 - House: Passed by indefinitely in Transportation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-26 - House: Passed by indefinitely in Transportation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Drivers to exercise due care. Requires drivers to exercise due care to avoid colliding with a pedestrian or the operator of a human-powered vehicle.
Title
Exercise due care; requires drivers to avoid colliding with pedestrian.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-26 | House: Passed by indefinitely in Transportation by voice vote | |
2012-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 3-N) | |
2012-01-20 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #2 | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101809D |