VA HB782 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utilities; battery deployment pilot programs. Requires the State Corporation Commission to conduct pilot programs under which Dominion Energy and Appalachian Power are required to submit proposals to deploy batteries. A utility may recover reasonable and prudent costs through its base rates. The pilot programs will have a duration of five years.
Title
Electric utilities; battery deployment pilot programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1558-Kilgore) by voice vote |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103133D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB782 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB782+hil |