VA HB781 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0654)
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0654)
Summary
Southwest Virginia Cultural Heritage Commission. Creates the Southwest Virginia Cultural Heritage Commission to encourage the economic development of Southwest Virginia through the expansion of cultural heritage ventures and initiatives related to tourism and other asset-based enterprises, including the Southwest Virginia Artisan Center, the Crooked Road, Round The Mountain, and related cultural heritage organizations and venues that promote entrepreneurial and employment opportunities. The bill sets out the membership of the Commission and its powers and duties. An emergency clause makes the bill effective upon its passage. This bill is identical to
Title
Southwest Virginia Cultural Heritage Commission, created.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0654) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 654 (effective 3/27/08) | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-07 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB781ER) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Emergency clause added | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Reported from Rules with amendment (13-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB781H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 081845588-H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Committee substitute printed 081845588-H1 | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-16 | House: Assigned GL sub: Professional/Occupational/Adminstrative Process | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086176812 |
Same As/Similar To
SB653 (Same As) 2010-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0688)
Subjects
Administration of Government
Arts and Humanities
Commissions, Boards and Institutions Generally
Southwest Virginia
Arts and Humanities
Commissions, Boards and Institutions Generally
Southwest Virginia
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB781 |