VA HB78 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0523)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0523)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Search warrants, subpoenas, court orders, or other process; menstrual health data prohibited. Prohibits the issuance of a search warrant, subpoena, court order, or other process for the purpose of the search and seizure or production of menstrual health data, as defined in the bill, including data stored on a computer, computer network, or other device containing electronic or digital information.
Title
Search warrants, subpoenas, court orders, or other process; menstrual health data prohibited.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 49-N) (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0523) | |
2024-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 523 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB78ER) |
2024-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-28 | House | VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 49-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 24108044D-S1 (51-Y 49-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 18-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB78S1 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24108044D-S1 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24108044D-S1 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Passage (51-Y 48-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (51-Y 48-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB78H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24107463D-H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-09 | House | Incorporates HB1359 (Convirs-Fowler) |
2024-02-09 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107463D-H1 |
2024-02-09 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 10-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2023-12-26 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-12-26 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100769D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1359 (Similar To) 2024-02-09 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
SB16 (Similar To) 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0571)
SB16 (Similar To) 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0571)