VA HB1359 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-09 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-09 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Search warrants; menstrual health data prohibited. Prohibits the issuance of a search warrant for the search and seizure of menstrual health data, as defined in the bill, stored on a computer, computer network, or other device containing electronic or digital information.
Title
Search warrants; menstrual health data prohibited, definition.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-09 | House | Incorporated by Courts of Justice |
2024-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB78-Watts) by voice vote |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2024-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24105029D |
Same As/Similar To
HB78 (Similar To) 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0523)
SB16 (Similar To) 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0571)
SB16 (Similar To) 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0571)
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+sum+HB1359 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HB1359+hil |