VA HB774 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Conditions of release; pretrial services agency. Provides that no person arrested for a felony or misdemeanor may be released into the custody of a pretrial services agency without a secured bond unless he is determined by a court to be indigent.
Title
Conditions of release; pretrial services agency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2016-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102820D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB774 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB774+hil |