VA HB764 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Consortium Comprehensive Cancer Center Advisory Board established. Establishes as an independent advisory board in state government a 13-member Consortium Comprehensive Cancer Center Advisory Board, consisting of the President of Virginia Commonwealth University or his designee, one member of the Virginia Commonwealth University Board of Visitors, the Vice President for Health Sciences at Virginia Commonwealth University or his designee, the President of the University of Virginia or his designee, one member of the University of Virginia Board of Visitors, the Executive Vice President for Health Affairs at the University of Virginia or his designee, one representative of Eastern Virginia Medical School, one representative of Virginia Tech Carilion School of Medicine and Research Institute, and five other nonlegislative citizen members, to study the requirements for designation as a consortium Comprehensive Cancer Center by the National Cancer Institute and make recommendations to Virginia Commonwealth University and the University of Virginia relating to the process for establishing a joint National Cancer Institute-designated consortium Comprehensive Cancer Center, including recommendations relating to a joint leadership structure, research integration, and programmatic integration. The provisions of the bill sunset on July 1, 2021.
Title
Consortium Comprehensive Cancer Center Advisory Board; established, report.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Failed to pass in House |
2018-03-10 | House | No further action taken |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB764H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18106056D-H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-09 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106056D-H1 |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred from Rules by voice vote |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101740D |