VA HB76 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB76

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Statute of limitations on written contract; missing persons declared dead; executor. Provides that, for any action that would be barred by the five-year statute of limitations on a written contract, wherein a person who would be party to such action was a missing person presumed dead and subsequently declared dead by court order, the executor of such person's estate has one year from the entry of such order to bring such an action, provided that a cause of action accrued on or after the date upon which such person went missing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statute of limitations on written contract; missing persons declared dead, executor of estate.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2020-01-31HouseContinued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2020-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
2019-12-06HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-12-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101269D

Same As/Similar To

HB76 (Carry Over) 2020-01-31 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801246(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback