VA HB759 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Strategic lawsuits against public participation; special motion to dismiss; stay of discovery; fees and costs. Establishes a procedure by which a party alleging that a claim filed against him is a strategic lawsuit against public participation (SLAPP), as defined in the bill, may file a special motion to dismiss. The bill provides that the filing of such a special motion to dismiss shall stay discovery proceedings related to the claim, pending the entry of an order adjudicating the special motion to dismiss. The bill provides that a court shall award reasonable expenses related to a special motion to dismiss, including attorney fees and costs, if the moving party prevails, in whole or in part, on such a special motion. The bill allows the court to award such reasonable expenses to a prevailing responding party to a special motion to dismiss if the court finds that such a motion was filed in bad faith or solely with the intent to delay the underlying proceedings.
Title
Strategic lawsuits against public participation; special motion to dismiss, stay of discovery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 6-N) (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 6-N) (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Failed to pass in House |
2020-03-12 | House | No further action taken |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senators: Edwards, Petersen, Chafin |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-02 | House | Delegates: VanValkenburg, Simon, Kilgore |
2020-03-02 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-02 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 20108626D-S1 (0-Y 96-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB759S1 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108626D-S1 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108626D-S1 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (64-Y 34-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (64-Y 34-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB759H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107492D-H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107492D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104817D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 01 | 223.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 223.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 670 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |