VA HB757 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Sex offenders in emergency shelters; notification registration. Provides that a registered sex offender who enters an emergency shelter designated by the Commonwealth or any political subdivision thereof and operated in response to a declared state or local emergency shall, as soon as practicable after entry, notify a member of the shelter's staff who is responsible for providing security of such person's status as a registered sex offender. The bill provides that any person who fails to notify the shelter's staff of his status as a registered sex offender is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill provides that the shelter's staff may access the publicly available information on the Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry regarding such person and use such information to ensure the safety of all persons in the shelter. The bill requires that the Department of State Police provide to any registered sex offender at the time of his initial registration a summary of his obligation to inform the staff of an emergency shelter of his status as a registered sex offender.
Title
Sex offenders in emergency shelters; notification registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (13-Y 86-N) (Y: 13 N: 86 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 4-N) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (13-Y 86-N) (Y: 13 N: 86 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 4-N) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Failed to pass |
2018-03-10 | House | No further action taken |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senators: Cosgrove, Spruill, Obenshain |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2018-03-07 | House | Delegates: Leftwich, Bell, Robert B., Herring |
2018-03-07 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2018-03-07 | House | House acceded to request |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (35-Y 5-N) |
2018-03-05 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (13-Y 86-N) |
2018-03-05 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 18107644D-S1 (13-Y 86-N) |
2018-03-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 3-N) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB757S1 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18107644D-S1 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18107644D-S1 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 4-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 4-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB757H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Amendment by Delegate Simon rejected |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18107012D-H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-09 | House | Incorporates HB187 (Hayes) |
2018-02-09 | House | Committee substitute printed 18107012D-H1 |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102541D |