VA HB748 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Parking violations at VDOT commuter lots; failure to appear. Provides that if a person issued a summons for a parking violation at a commuter parking lot owned by the Virginia Department of Transportation fails to appear after being mailed a summons at the address on record with the Department of Motor Vehicles, the person shall be deemed to have waived a court hearing and the court may hear the case in his absence. A violation is a traffic infraction. Under existing law, if the person fails to appear the summons is to be delivered by personal or substitute service.
Title
VDOT commuter lots; parking violations, failure to appear in court.
Sponsors
Del. Thomas Rust [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | House | Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2014-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2014-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-14 | House | Referred from Transportation by voice vote |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101405D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB748 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB748+hil |