VA HB748 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0299)
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0299)
Summary
Innovative Technology Authority; board of directors. Removes the Secretaries of Education and Commerce and Trade, as well the Director of the State Council of Higher Education, from the board of directors of the Authority. The bill also makes a technical correction. The bill is identical to
Title
Innovative Technology Authority; board of directors.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] | Del. Kristen Amundson [D] | Del. David Bulova [D] | Del. Charles Caputo [D] |
Del. Albert Eisenberg [D] | Del. David Toscano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0299) | |
2008-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 299 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-27 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-27 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB748ER) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-08 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-07 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-05 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-16 | House: Assigned GL sub: Professional/Occupational/Adminstrative Process | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 089809456 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB748 |