VA HB737 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Use of unmanned aircraft system for surveillance; penalty. Makes it a Class 3 misdemeanor to use an unmanned aircraft system to capture an image of private property or an individual located on such private property after having been given written notice by the landowner or other person lawfully in charge of such private property that the individual, landowner, or other person objects to having such images taken. The bill also provides that the sale or dissemination of such a captured image is punishable as a Class 2 misdemeanor.
Title
Unmanned aircraft system; use for capturing photographic or video images, penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | House | Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2016-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101067D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB737 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB737+hil |