VA HB734 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-03 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-03 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; public school renovation tax credit. Provides an income tax credit to taxpayers that undertake and complete a public school renovation, in accordance with the provisions of the Public-Private Education Facilities and Infrastructure Act, for taxable years beginning on and after January 1, 2010. The amount of the credit is 25 percent of the taxpayer's eligible renovation expenses but cannot exceed $1 million in any one taxable year. Also, there is a cap of $100 million on the total amount of credits that may be allowed for all taxpayers in a taxable year.
Title
Income tax, state; public school renovation tax credit.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-03 | House: Left in Finance | |
2010-02-01 | House: Continued to 2011 in Finance by voice vote | |
2010-01-29 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 (4-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #3 | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103349D |