VA HB730 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0248)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0248)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reporting of payments by third-party settlement organizations. Requires third-party settlement organizations (TPSOs) to report to the Tax Department the gross amount of payments made to any participating payee, a person who receives payment from a TPSO. Generally speaking, a TPSO is a company that provides a platform for buyers and sellers to transact goods or services and settles transactions between those parties. Examples of TPSOs would be marketplace facilitators and "gig economy" platforms. Under federal law, payments by TPSOs to participating payees need not be reported unless they exceed $20,000 and there are more than 200 transactions between the TPSO and the participating payee. The bill instead requires use of the standard 1099 reporting threshold of $600 for non-TPSO income as the level at which TPSO income must be reported to the Tax Department. The requirements of the bill apply only to payments to participating payees with a Virginia address.
Title
Third-party settlement organizations; reporting of payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Finance (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (9-Y 11-N) (Y: 9 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Finance (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (9-Y 11-N) (Y: 9 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0248) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 248 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-03 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 10, 2020 | |
2020-03-03 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB730ER) |
2020-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-28 | House | VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House (58-Y 40-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-22 | House | Reported from Finance (14-Y 8-N) |
2020-01-22 | House | Reconsidered by Finance |
2020-01-15 | House | Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (9-Y 11-N) |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100549D |
Same As/Similar To
SB211 (Same As) 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0063)