VA HB73 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Substance abuse screening and assessment of public assistance applicants and recipients. Requires local departments of social services to screen each VIEW program participant to determine whether probable cause exists to believe the participant is engaged in the use of illegal substances. The bill provides that when a screening indicates reasonable cause to believe a participant is using illegal substances, the local department of social services shall require a formal substance abuse assessment of the participant, which may include drug testing. Any person who fails or refuses to participate in a screening or assessment without good cause or who tests positive for the use of illegal substances shall be ineligible to receive TANF payments for a period of one year, unless he enters into and complies with the requirements of a drug treatment program; however, an individual has one opportunity during the subsequent 12-month period to comply with the screening, assessment, or treatment requirements and be reinstated to eligibility for TANF benefits.
Title
VIEW; substance abuse screening and assessment of public assistance applicants and recipients.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2012-02-08 | House | Continued to 2013 in Appropriations by voice vote |
2012-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2013 by voice vote |
2012-01-24 | House | Incorporates HB221 |
2012-01-24 | House | Incorporates HB598 |
2012-01-24 | House | Incorporates HB249 |
2012-01-24 | House | Incorporates HB955 |
2012-01-24 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2012-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2012-01-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 12104603D-H1 |
2012-01-24 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (14-Y 8-N) |
2012-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 3-N) |
2012-01-20 | House | Assigned HWI sub: #1 |
2011-12-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2011-12-21 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100462D |
Same As/Similar To
HB221 (Similar To)