VA HB73 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - House: Continued to 2011 in Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - House: Continued to 2011 in Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax; additional personal exemption. Provides an additional personal exemption of $800 for each individual who qualifies as a surviving spouse or head of household for federal income tax purposes for the taxable year, beginning on and after January 1, 2010.
Title
Income tax, state; additional personal exemption for surviving spouse or head of household.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | House: Continued to 2011 in Finance by voice vote | |
2010-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 (10-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #2 | |
2009-12-29 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2009-12-29 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101086D |