VA HB722 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0072)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0072)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; exclusions; proprietary records and trade secrets; affordable housing loan applications. Excludes from mandatory disclosure financial and proprietary records submitted with a loan application to a locality for the preservation or construction of affordable housing that is related to a competitive application to be submitted to either the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD) or the Virginia Housing Development Authority (VHDA), when the release of such records would adversely affect the bargaining or competitive position of the applicant. The bill also provides that such financial and proprietary records shall not be withheld after they have been made public by HUD or VHDA.
Title
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; exclusions, proprietary records and trade secrets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0072) | |
2020-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 72 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 3, 2020 | |
2020-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB722ER) |
2020-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-29 | House | VOTE: (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-23 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101942D |
Same As/Similar To
SB269 (Same As) 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0079)