VA HB720 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Transportation; transportation projects in Planning District 8. Requires the Department of Transportation (VDOT) or the Department of Rail and Public Transportation to hold a public hearing regarding any transportation project valued in excess of $10 million in Planning District 8 at the conclusion of the project's preliminary design phase but before the detailed design phase begins and requires VDOT to evaluate such projects and make public the results of such evaluations not less than 14 days prior to such hearing.
Title
Transportation projects in Planning District 8; public hearings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Transportation |
2016-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-15 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103849D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB720 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB720+hil |