VA HB720 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Worker retraining tax credit; increase in credit amount. Increases the worker retraining tax credit for worker retraining courses taken by employees at private schools from a maximum of $100 per year per employee to $250 per year per employee or $500 per year per employee if the worker retraining includes retraining in a STEM or STEAM (science, technology, engineering, mathematics, or applied mathematics) discipline, including but not limited to a health care-related discipline.
Title
Worker retraining tax credit; increase in credit amount for tax years beginning January 1, 2012.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 1-N) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Left in Finance |
2012-02-10 | House | Continued to 2013 in Finance by voice vote |
2012-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 1-N) |
2012-01-20 | House | Assigned Finance sub: #3 |
2012-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2012-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103169D |