VA HB72 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 4 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]


Statewide prioritization process project selection. Requires the total cost of a transportation project to be considered in evaluating projects under the statewide prioritization process. The bill requires the Commonwealth Transportation Board to evaluate congestion mitigation on the basis of total traffic volumes, not just traffic volumes during weekdays. The bill imposes restrictions on projects receiving funding from the High Priority Projects Program that are evaluated under the statewide prioritization process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Statewide prioritization process project selection; cost of project to be considered.



2018-02-13HouseLeft in Transportation
2018-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 by voice vote
2018-01-29HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Ad Hoc Subcommittee #4
2017-12-04HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2017-12-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102019D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
332214.1(n/a)See Bill Text
332370(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

Bill Comments