VA HB719 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0421)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0421)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Administration of government; general provisions; state publications to be made available in electronic format. Requires state publications provided to (i) the General Assembly or any committee, subcommittee, commission, agency, or other body within the legislative branch or (ii) the chairman or agency head of such entity and publications of any agency, institution, collegial body, or other governmental entity to be made available as read-only and text-searchable Portable Document Format (.pdf) files or some other widely used and accessible read-only and text-searchable electronic document format. All requests for such reports or publications shall be made electronically unless expressly requested otherwise.
Title
Administration of government; state publications to be made available in electronic format.
Sponsors
Del. David Reid [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0421) | |
2020-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 421 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-06 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB719ER) |
2020-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-31 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Printed as engrossed 20101019D-E |
2020-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB719E |
2020-01-30 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-27 | House | Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with amendments (20-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned CT & I sub: Communications |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101019D |