VA HB712 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-10 - Left in Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-10 - Left in Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Naming highways, bridges, interchanges, and other transportation facilities. Removes the authority of the Commonwealth Transportation Board (the Board) to name any highway, bridge, interchange, or other transportation facility forming a part of the system of state highways after a private entity. The bill provides that the Board shall not have the power to name any highway, bridge, interchange, or transportation facility that has been or may hereafter be named by the General Assembly, nor may the name chosen by the Board reflect the name of any living person. The bill repeals the requirement that the Department of Transportation develop guidelines on the naming of highways, bridges, interchanges, and other transportation facilities after private entities.
Title
Highways, bridges, interchanges, and other transportation facilities; authority to name.
Sponsors
Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Motion to recommit to committee agreed to (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Left in Transportation |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Recommitted to Transportation |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee agreed to (21-Y 19-N) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (94-Y 4-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Printed as engrossed 18101542D-E |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB712E |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendments (17-Y 4-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-26 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101542D |