VA HB710 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public school buses; decals; "In God We Trust." Permits local school boards, notwithstanding any regulation to the contrary, to display decals containing the motto "In God We Trust" on public school buses, provided that no such decal obstructs the name of the school division or the number of the school bus.
Title
Public school buses; decals displaying "In God We Trust."
Sponsors
Del. Larry Rush [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N) (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Education |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102636D |