VA HB710 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0695)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0695)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Use of mine voids. Establishes the presumption that, unless specified by contract, the owner of the coal mineral estate retains the rights to extract any coal remaining in place and to use an underground void for any activity related to the removal of coal from the subject property or other properties. No injunction shall be allowed to prevent such uses where the void is governed by a mine permit. Where the void is located within a sealed mine for which a mining permit no longer exists, the owner of the coal mineral estate must pay reasonable compensation for the consent of the void's owner, and the void's owner may not unreasonably withhold such consent.
Title
Coal mining; right to use shell, void opened underground, etc., created by removal of coal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 33-N) (Y: 67 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 20-N) (Y: 80 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 20-N) (Y: 80 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0695) | |
2012-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 695 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-10 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-10 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB710ER) | |
2012-03-10 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-08 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 33-N) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 12105954D-S2 (65-Y 33-N) | |
2012-03-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (27-Y 13-N) | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB710S2 | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Substitute by Senator Stuart agreed to 12105954D-S2 | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Floor substitute printed 12105954D-S2 (Stuart) | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Amendment by Senator Hanger withdrawn | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Committee substitute rejected 12105796D-S1 | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105796D-S1 | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 7-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-13 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 20-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read third time and passed House (78-Y 20-N) | |
2012-02-10 | House: Printed as engrossed 12101205D-E | |
2012-02-10 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB710E | |
2012-02-10 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-02-10 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-08 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (18-Y 4-N) | |
2012-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | House: Assigned ACNRsub: Natural Resources | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101205D |