VA HB70 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Immunity of employers; employees and independent contractors convicted of a nonviolent offense; negligent hiring. Provides that no cause of action for negligent hiring against an employer shall arise solely because such employer hired an employee or independent contractor convicted of a nonviolent offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Immunity of employers; employees and independent contractors convicted of a nonviolent offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2018-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N)
2018-01-16HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2017-12-04HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-12-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100943D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801226.14(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback