VA HB70 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - House: Incorporated by Education (HB926-Bell, Robert B.) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - House: Incorporated by Education (HB926-Bell, Robert B.) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Nonpublic school students; participation in interscholastic sports. Directs a nonprofit corporation founded in Virginia in 1913 to organize and govern interscholastic activities among the public high schools to provide an exception to its rules allowing eligibility for participation in interscholastic sports by a student who is receiving home instruction and who is eligible for free tuition in a public school in Virginia.
Title
Students, nonpublic school; participation in public school interscholastic programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | House: Incorporated by Education (HB926-Bell, Robert B.) by voice vote | |
2010-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1001-Nutter) by voice vote | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned Education sub: #2 Students and Daycare | |
2009-12-29 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2009-12-29 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100254D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB70 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB70+hil |