VA HB691 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0336)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0336)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Workplace safety; employer reporting requirements. Extends from eight to 24 hours the time period within which an employer is required to notify the Virginia Department of Labor and Industry of any work-related incident resulting in hospitalization, amputation, or loss of an eye.
Title
Workplace safety; employer reporting requirements for work-related incidents.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0336) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 336 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 11, 2016 | |
2016-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/4/16 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-29 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB691ER) |
2016-02-29 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-01-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-25 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-19 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2016-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100453D |