VA HB690 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0659)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0659)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Condominium and Property Owners' Association Acts; merger of developments; reformation of declaration. Provides a process for the merger of two or more associations and a process for seeking judicial reformation of the declaration in both Acts. The reformation procedure includes, among other requirements, at least 30 days' notice to the owners and the mortgagee and gives the mortgagee standing to participate in the reformation proceedings.
Title
Condominium & Property Owners' Association Acts; merger of developments, reformation of declaration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0659) | |
2014-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 659 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB690ER) |
2014-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (34-Y 6-N) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 2-N) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB690H2 |
2014-02-07 | House | Substitute by Delegate Massie agreed to 14104927D-H2 |
2014-02-07 | House | Floor substitute printed 14104927D-H2 (Massie) |
2014-02-07 | House | Committee substitute rejected 14103953D-H1 |
2014-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-06 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-04 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 14103953D-H1 |
2014-01-30 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101914D |