VA HB689 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0213)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0213)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; employer duty to furnish medical attention; cost limit. Adds scooters to the list of medical equipment an employer is required to furnish to an employee under certain circumstances under the Virginia Workers' Compensation Act. The bill raises the limit on the aggregate cost of items and modifications required to be furnished by an employer to an injured employee from $42,000 to $55,000, to be increased on an annual basis. Workers' compensation; employer duty to furnish medical attention; cost limit. Adds scooters to the list of medical equipment an employer is required to furnish to an employee under certain circumstances under the Virginia Workers' Compensation Act. The bill raises the limit on the aggregate cost of items and modifications required to be furnished by an employer to an injured employee from $42,000 to $55,000, to be increased on an annual basis.
Title
Workers' compensation; employer duty to furnish medical attention, cost limit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0213) | |
2022-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 213 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB689ER) |
2022-03-08 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 22101147D-E |
2022-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB689E |
2022-02-04 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-01 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101147D |