VA HB681 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0058)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0058)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Interest on appeal. Adds specificity to the description of the time period for which interest is paid on a judgment affirmed by an appellate court to provide that interest is computed from the date of filing the notice of appeal to the date the appellate court issues its mandate.
Title
Interest on appeal; computed from date of filing notice of to date appellate court issues mandate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0058) | |
2012-03-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 58 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-17 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-17 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB681ER) | |
2012-02-17 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-01-27 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-27 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-25 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-23 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-18 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-17 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100803D |