VA HB674 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0361)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0361)
Summary
Five-year plan for aging; report. Requires the Department for the Aging to develop and maintain a four-year plan for aging services. The bill requires the Department to consult with various state and local agencies and details a list of factors to be included in the plan for consideration in determining when additional funds may be needed for various programs and services.
Title
Aging, Department for; four-year plan therefor, report.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0361) | |
2008-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 361 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-27 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-27 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB674ER) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB674H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 081825408-H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Passed by temporarily | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Committee substitute printed 081825408-H1 | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-28 | House: Assigned GL sub: Professional/Occupational/Adminstrative Process | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084024408 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB674 |