VA HB673 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0127)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0127)
Summary
Animal welfare standards. Requires that "adequate water" for animals is replenished in a manner that is appropriate for the weather and temperature. Currently, "adequate water" must be replenished at least once every 12 hours.
Title
Animals; clarifies several standards of welfare.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0127) | |
2008-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 127 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-21 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB673ER) | |
2008-02-21 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-04 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-04 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-04 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-01 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB673H1 | |
2008-02-01 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 083247408-H1 | |
2008-02-01 | House: Read second time | |
2008-01-31 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-30 | House: Committee substitute printed 083247408-H1 | |
2008-01-30 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-17 | House: Assigned ACNRsub: #1 Agriculture | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 088708408 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB673 |