VA HB672 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Assistant attorneys for the Commonwealth; Compensation Board. Provides that the Compensation Board shall provide for employing at least one compensated assistant to the attorney for the Commonwealth in every county and city where the attorney for the Commonwealth devotes his full time to his duties and does not engage in the private practice of law. Under current law, the Compensation Board has discretion in determining if a county or city needs to employ any compensated assistants to the attorney for the Commonwealth.
Title
Assistant attorneys for the Commonwealth; Compensation Board to provide for every county and city.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101825D |