VA HB669 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Public pools; regulations. Directs the Commissioner of Health to convene a work group to study whether swimming pools and other water recreational facilities for public use or use in conjunction with a tourist facility or health spa should be regulated by the Department of Health and requires the work group to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the Chairmen of the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions and the Senate Committee on Education and Health by November 1, 2023. Public pools; regulations. Directs the Commissioner of Health to convene a work group to study whether swimming pools and other water recreational facilities for public use or use in conjunction with a tourist facility or health spa should be regulated by the Department of Health and requires the work group to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the Chairmen of the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions and the Senate Committee on Education and Health by November 1, 2023.
Title
Swimming pools & water recreational facilities; study to determine whether VDH should regulate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: (57-Y 43-N) (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: (57-Y 43-N) (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | House | House sustained Governor's veto |
2022-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB669ER) |
2022-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: (57-Y 43-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (57-Y 43-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB669H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22105800D-H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105800D-H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103720D |