VA HB661 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0169)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0169)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Limitation of prosecutions; falsifying patient records. Increases from one year to three years the statute of limitations on prosecutions for the misdemeanor of falsifying patient records with the intent to defraud.
Title
Falsifying patient records; statute of limitation on prosecutions increased.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0169) | |
2014-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 169 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB661ER) |
2014-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-19 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-19 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-24 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101690D |