VA HB649 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibited public carrying of certain firearms; penalty. Prohibits the carrying of a loaded shotgun or rifle in places open to the public in certain cities and counties. Current law prohibits the carrying in such locations of certain loaded firearms with high-capacity magazines, silencers, folding stock, or long ammunition or a loaded shotgun with a magazine that will hold more than seven rounds of the longest ammunition for which it is chambered. The bill adds the City of Roanoke to the list of cities in which the carrying of such firearms is prohibited.
Title
Firearms, certain; prohibited public carrying, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-15 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100882D |