VA HB649 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0032)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0032)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Odometer tampering. Increases the minimum civil penalty for odometer tampering from $1,500 to $3,000.
Title
Vehicle odometers; increases penalty for tampering.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-28 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0032) | |
2012-02-28 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 32 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-16 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-15 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-15 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB649ER) | |
2012-02-15 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-01 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-01-31 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-30 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-27 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-26 | House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103505D |
Same As/Similar To
SB481 (Same As) 2012-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0122)