VA HB647 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0044)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0044)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public education; student literacy measures. Clarifies several provisions of the Virginia Literacy Act (the Act), enacted during the 2022 Regular Session of the General Assembly and effective with the 2024-2025 school year, including (i) clarifying that the term "evidence-based literacy instruction" does not include practices that instruct students to gain meaning from print through the use of (a) three-cueing, which includes semantic, syntactic, and graphophonic cues; (b) meaning, structure, and visual cues; or (c) visual memory for word recognition; (ii) removing the option to use a literacy screener approved by the Department of Education for certain purposes enumerated in the Act; (iii) requiring the Department to develop a list of core literacy curricula for students in kindergarten through grade five and supplemental instruction practices and programs and intervention programs for students in kindergarten through grade eight that consist of evidence-based literacy instruction aligned with science-based reading research; and (iv) requiring each divisionwide literacy plan to address how the local school board will align (a) core reading and literacy curriculum for students in kindergarten through grade five and (b) screening, supplemental instruction, and interventions for students in kindergarten through grade eight with evidence-based literacy instruction practices aligned with science-based reading research.
Title
Public education; student literacy measures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0044) | |
2024-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 44 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2024 |
2024-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB647ER) |
2024-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-01-30 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-24 | House | Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100696D |
Same As/Similar To
SB624 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0012)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 253.13:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 253.13:6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |