VA HB640 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - House: Passed by indefinitely in General Laws (12-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - House: Passed by indefinitely in General Laws (12-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Governor's Development Opportunity Fund; name change. Changes the name of the Governor's Development Opportunity Fund to the "Commonwealth Economic Development Fund."
Title
Governor's Development Opportunity Fund; changes name to Commonwealth Economic Development Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-09 - House - House: Passed by indefinitely in General Laws (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | House: Passed by indefinitely in General Laws (12-Y 9-N) | |
2010-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102044D |