VA HB63 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal cases; request for a jury to ascertain punishment. Provides that an accused may withdraw a request for a jury to ascertain punishment up until the commencement of the sentencing proceeding. The bill also provides that counsel for either party shall have the right to examine jurors regarding the potential range of punishment regardless of whether the jury will ascertain punishment and that the court or counsel for either party may inform any person or juror during voir dire as to the potential range of punishment to ascertain if the person or juror can sit impartially in the guilt or sentencing phase of the case. Criminal cases; request for a jury to ascertain punishment. Provides that an accused may withdraw a request for a jury to ascertain punishment up until the commencement of the sentencing proceeding. The bill also provides that counsel for either party shall have the right to examine jurors regarding the potential range of punishment regardless of whether the jury will ascertain punishment and that the court or counsel for either party may inform any person or juror during voir dire as to the potential range of punishment to ascertain if the person or juror can sit impartially in the guilt or sentencing phase of the case.
Title
Criminal cases; request for a jury to ascertain punishment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 42-N) (Y: 53 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 42-N) (Y: 53 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | House sustained Governor's veto |
2024-03-20 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB63ER) |
2024-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 5-N) |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-01-26 | House | VOTE: Passage (53-Y 42-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House (53-Y 42-N) |
2024-01-25 | House | Passed by for the day |
2024-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB63H1 |
2024-01-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24105580D-H1 |
2024-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2024-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 24105580D-H1 |
2024-01-19 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 7-N) |
2024-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) |
2023-12-22 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-12-22 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102961D |