VA HB627 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Violation of ordinances; schedule of civil penalties. Allows localities to create schedules of fines and penalties for violations of designated ordinances. The bill establishes limits on fine amounts and frequency, as well as guidance on separate offenses. The bill precludes prosecution as a criminal misdemeanor for aggregate penalties of all offenses from the same operative set of facts totaling less than $5,000. The bill allows prosecution as a criminal misdemeanor for violations arising from the same operative set of facts for penalties totaling $5,000 or more. The bill provides for civil summons, waiver of trial, admitting liability, and payment of the penalty. The bill provides trial procedure and abatement of the offense and it creates liens for unpaid penalties and enforcement guidelines for such liens. Violation of ordinances; schedule of civil penalties. Allows localities to create schedules of fines and penalties for violations of designated ordinances. The bill establishes limits on fine amounts and frequency, as well as guidance on separate offenses. The bill precludes prosecution as a criminal misdemeanor for aggregate penalties of all offenses from the same operative set of facts totaling less than $5,000. The bill allows prosecution as a criminal misdemeanor for violations arising from the same operative set of facts for penalties totaling $5,000 or more. The bill provides for civil summons, waiver of trial, admitting liability, and payment of the penalty. The bill provides trial procedure and abatement of the offense and it creates liens for unpaid penalties and enforcement guidelines for such liens.
Title
Violation of ordinances; schedule of civil penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2022-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 4-N) |
2022-01-28 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103110D |