VA HB625 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0770)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0770)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation planning; comprehensive plan. Provides that when a locality in Planning District 8 (Northern Virginia) submits a proposed comprehensive plan or amendment to the Department of Transportation for review, the Department will determine the extent to which the proposal will increase traffic congestion or reduce the mobility of citizens in the event of a homeland security emergency and shall include such information as part of its comments on the proposed plan or amendment. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Transportation planning; proposed comprehensive plans in Northern Virginia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 6-N) (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N) (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 6-N) (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N) (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0770) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 770 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB625ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 6-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (88-Y 6-N) | |
2012-04-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-07 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB625ER) | |
2012-03-07 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-08 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N) | |
2012-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House (91-Y 6-N) | |
2012-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB625H1 | |
2012-02-07 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105013D-H1 | |
2012-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-03 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105013D-H1 | |
2012-02-03 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-17 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103957D |