VA HB623 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0900)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Gender-neutral terms; prohibitions on same-sex marriage and civil unions removed from Code; certain gender-specific crimes; penalty. Replaces the terms "husband" and "wife," as well as related terms, with gender-neutral terms throughout the Code to comport with the United States Supreme Court decision in Obergefell v. Hodges, 576 U.S. ___ (June 26, 2015). The bill also repeals the statutory prohibitions on same-sex marriages and civil unions or other arrangements between persons of the same sex purporting to bestow the privileges and obligations of marriage, and it makes conforming changes to various laws involving married individuals and their rights stemming from marriage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gender-neutral terms; prohibitions on same-sex marriage and civil unions removed from Code.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 43-N) (Y: 53 N: 42 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N) (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 8-N) (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-09 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0900)
2020-04-09 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 900 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-17 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-17HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020
2020-03-12SenateSigned by President
2020-03-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-12HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB623ER)
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled
2020-03-04HouseVOTE: Adoption (53-Y 43-N)
2020-03-04HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 20108628D-S1 (53-Y 43-N)
2020-03-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-03-03SenatePassed Senate with substitute (24-Y 16-N)
2020-03-03SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB623S1
2020-03-03SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-03-03SenateRead third time
2020-03-02SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-28SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-28SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20108628D-S1
2020-02-28SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-28SenateRead third time
2020-02-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 3-N)
2020-02-19SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-19SenateCommittee substitute printed 20108628D-S1
2020-02-19SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 5-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (57-Y 41-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseReported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 8-N)
2020-02-06HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N)
2020-02-04HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2020-01-06HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100908D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
131435(n/a)See Bill Text
18219(n/a)See Bill Text
182346(n/a)See Bill Text
182362(n/a)See Bill Text
182363(n/a)See Bill Text
182364(n/a)See Bill Text
182365(n/a)See Bill Text
182366(n/a)See Bill Text
182368(n/a)See Bill Text
182417(n/a)See Bill Text
18249(n/a)See Bill Text
18267.5:2(n/a)See Bill Text
192271.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192271.2(n/a)See Bill Text
192305(n/a)See Bill Text
19269(n/a)See Bill Text
321127(n/a)See Bill Text
321134.01(n/a)See Bill Text
321257(n/a)See Bill Text
321258.1(n/a)See Bill Text
321271(n/a)See Bill Text
32169.1(n/a)See Bill Text
372714(n/a)See Bill Text
3822204(n/a)See Bill Text
3822212(n/a)See Bill Text
382302(n/a)See Bill Text
3824019(n/a)See Bill Text
5813210(n/a)See Bill Text
5813211.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5813219.5(n/a)See Bill Text
5813219.6(n/a)See Bill Text
581322.02(n/a)See Bill Text
581324(n/a)See Bill Text
581326(n/a)See Bill Text
5813343(n/a)See Bill Text
581339.8(n/a)See Bill Text
581341(n/a)See Bill Text
581344.3(n/a)See Bill Text
581344.4(n/a)See Bill Text
5813506.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5813506.2(n/a)See Bill Text
581490(n/a)See Bill Text
581499(n/a)See Bill Text
581520(n/a)See Bill Text
581810(n/a)See Bill Text
591332(n/a)See Bill Text
621526(n/a)See Bill Text
621527(n/a)See Bill Text
6321519(n/a)See Bill Text
632510(n/a)See Bill Text
642200(n/a)See Bill Text
6422401(n/a)See Bill Text
642905(n/a)See Bill Text
652512(n/a)See Bill Text
652515(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB623&201+sum+HB623
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB623+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB623S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB623ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0900+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0801V0147+HB0623
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H08V0232+HB0623
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0863+HB0623
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S03V0394+HB0623
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0466+HB0623
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1203HB0623+HB0623
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1475HB0623+HB0623
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1815+HB0623

Bill Comments

feedback