VA HB622 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1210)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Limiting employees' sharing of wage information prohibited; civil penalty. Prohibits an employer from discharging or taking other retaliatory action against an employee because the employee inquired about or discussed with, or disclosed to, another employee any information about either the employee's own wages or other compensation or about any other employee's wages or other compensation. Violations are subject to a civil penalty of $100.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limiting employees' sharing of wage information; prohibited, exception, civil penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (48-Y 44-N) (Y: 48 N: 43 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 39-N) (Y: 55 N: 38 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N) (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1210)
2020-04-22HouseEnacted, Chapter 1210 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-04-22SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2020-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2020-04-22HouseReenrolled bill text (HB622ER2)
2020-04-22HouseReenrolled
2020-04-22 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (22-Y 18-N)
2020-04-22HouseVOTE: (48-Y 44-N)
2020-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (48-Y 44-N)
2020-04-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-04-11HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-03SenateSigned by President
2020-03-02HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-02HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB622ER)
2020-03-02HouseEnrolled
2020-02-26HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (55-Y 39-N)
2020-02-26SenateChair votes Yes
2020-02-26SenatePassed Senate with amendment (20-Y 20-N)
2020-02-26SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2020-02-26SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-26SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-26SenateRead third time
2020-02-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: Adoption (55-Y 39-N)
2020-02-24SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (9-Y 4-N)
2020-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-05HouseVOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N)
2020-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (54-Y 44-N)
2020-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB622H1
2020-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107144D-H1
2020-02-04HouseRead second time
2020-02-03HouseRead first time
2020-01-30HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (13-Y 8-N)
2020-01-30HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107144D-H1
2020-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 3-N)
2020-01-14HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1
2020-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101336D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40128.7:7(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB622&201+sum+HB622
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB622+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB622H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB622ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB622ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1210+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1401V0031+HB0622
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H14V0137+HB0622
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0428+HB0622
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0222+HB0622
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1413+HB0622
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1050HB0622+HB0622
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1066HB0622+HB0622
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV2017HB0622+HB0622
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2164+HB0622

Bill Comments

feedback