VA HB615 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Audio-visual deposition; uses. Prohibits an attorney authorized to practice before a court in the Commonwealth from posting or releasing to the Internet any portion of a video deposition without the written permission of the individual being deposed.
Title
Audio-visual deposition; uses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2014-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102116D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB615 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB615+hil |