VA HB613 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0425)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0425)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Rail and Public Transportation; acquisition of real estate and rights-of-way. Authorizes the Department of Rail and Public Transportation to acquire real estate or rights-of-way for the construction of railway lines or rail or public transportation facilities or the retention of rail corridors for public purposes. The bill provides that acquisition of real property for office space or district offices remains subject to review by the Department of General Services and approval by the Governor.
Title
Rail and Public Transportation, Department of; acquisition of real estate and rights-of-way.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (30-Y 8-N) (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (9-Y 3-N) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 24-N) (Y: 75 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (9-Y 3-N) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 24-N) (Y: 75 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0425) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0425) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 425 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB613ER) |
2016-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (30-Y 8-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (9-Y 3-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-12 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 24-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Read third time and passed House (73-Y 24-N) |
2016-02-11 | House | Printed as engrossed 16100379D-E |
2016-02-11 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB613E |
2016-02-11 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2016-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-09 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendments (15-Y 7-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100379D |