VA HB611 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Certificate of public need; exception. Authorizes the State Health Commissioner (Commissioner) to accept and review applications and issue a certificate of public need for new neonatal care services in Planning District 5, provided that certain conditions are met. The bill provides that the Commissioner shall not deny the application on the basis of economic or service volume impact on existing providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Certificate of public need; issuance for new neonatal care services in Planning District 5.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (49-Y 46-N) (Y: 49 N: 46 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-30SenateLeft in Education and Health
2018-03-01SenateContinued to 2019 in Education and Health (13-Y 2-N)
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-07HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (49-Y 46-N)
2018-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House (49-Y 46-N)
2018-02-06HouseRead second time and engrossed
2018-02-05HouseRead first time
2018-02-01HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (12-Y 9-N)
2018-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
2018-01-17HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
2018-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2018-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102444D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback